Bishops
Name | Term in office |
---|---|
Johann Baptist von Keller | 28 Jan 1828 – 17 Oct 1845 |
Josef von Lipp | 14 Jun 1847 – 3 May 1869 |
Karl Joseph von Hefele | 17 Jun 1869 – 5 Jun 1893 |
Wilhelm von Reiser | 5 Jun 1893 – 11 May 1898 |
Franz Xaver von Linsenmann | 20 Jul 1898 – 21 Sep 1898 |
Paul Wilhelm Keppler | 11 Nov 1898 – 16 Jul 1926 |
Johannes Baptista Sproll | 29 Mar 1927 – 4 Mar 1949 |
Carl Joseph Leiprecht | 4 Jul 1949 – 4 Jun 1974 |
Georg Moser | 12 Mar 1975 – 9 May 1988 |
Walter Kasper | 17 Apr 1989 – 31 May 1999 |
Gebhard Fürst | since 7 Jul 2000 |
Read more about this topic: Roman Catholic Diocese Of Rottenburg-Stuttgart