Standings Changes Since The 5th General Election
Changes to party standings during the 5th Alberta Legislature
|
Membership changes in the 5th Assembly | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | Member Name | District | Party | Reason | |
July 11, 1921 | Charles Stewart | Sedgewick | Liberal | Acclaimed in the 1921 general election | |
July 11, 1921 | Andrew Shandro | Whitford | Liberal | Acclaimed in the 1921 general election | |
July 18, 1921 | See List of Members | Election day of the fifth Alberta general election | |||
July 20, 1921 | Percival Baker | Ponoka | United Farmers | Died before taking office | |
August 1, 1921 | Donald Kennedy | Peace River | United Farmers | Resigned to run in the 1921 federal election. | |
November 16, 1921 | Alex Ross | Calgary | Dominion Labor | Resigned to run in a ministerial by-election | |
November 16, 1921 | Vernor Smith | Camrose | United Farmers | Resigned to run in a ministerial by-election | |
November 16, 1921 | Perren Baker | Medicine Hat | United Farmers | Resigned to run in a ministerial by-election | |
November 16, 1921 | George Hoadley | Okotoks | United Farmers | Resigned to run in a ministerial by-election | |
December 2, 1921 | Alex Ross | Calgary | Dominion Labor | Acclaimed for December 9, 1921 by-election | |
December 2, 1921 | Vernor Smith | Camrose | United Farmers | Acclaimed for December 9, 1921 by-election | |
December 2, 1921 | Perren Baker | Medicine Hat | United Farmers | Acclaimed for December 9, 1921 by-election | |
December 2, 1921 | George Hoadley | Okotoks | United Farmers | Acclaimed for December 9, 1921 by-election | |
December 2, 1921 | Herbert Greenfield | Peace River | United Farmers | Acclaimed for December 9, 1921 by-election | |
December 2, 1921 | John Brownlee | Ponoka | United Farmers | Acclaimed for December 9, 1921 by-election | |
December 4, 1921 | Andrew Shandro | Whitford | Liberal | Removed from office by court order 1921 election voided | |
December 29, 1921 | Charles Stewart | Sedgewick | Liberal | Appointed to the federal cabinet. | |
March 28, 1922 | Charles Wright | Ribstone | United Farmers | Died from pneumonia | |
July 3, 1922 | Albert Andrews | Sedgewick | United Farmers | Acclaimed for July 10, 1922 by-election | |
July 10, 1922 | William Farquharson | Ribstone | United Farmers | Elected in a by-election | |
July 10, 1922 | Mike Chornohus | Whitford | United Farmers | Elected in a by-election | |
November 14, 1922 | Robert Edwards | Calgary | Independent | Died | |
January 15, 1923 | William Davidson | Calgary | Independent | Elected in a by-election | |
August 10, 1923 | Joseph State | Clearwater | Liberal | Died | |
November 10, 1923 | Jean Côté | Grouard | Liberal | Appointed to the Canadian Senate | |
April 12, 1924 | Vacant | Clearwater | Vacant | District abolished by the United Farmers government. | |
July 11, 1924 | Leonidas Giroux | Grouard | Liberal | Elected in a by-election | |
August 27, 1924 | John Boyle | Edmonton | Liberal | Appointed to the bench | |
October 27, 1924 | William Henry | Edmonton | Liberal | Elected in a by-election | |
June 6, 1925 | William Johnston | Medicine Hat | Dominion Labor | Died | |
September 29, 1925 | Charles Pingle | Medicine Hat | Liberal | Elected in a by-election | |
October 15, 19251 | Charles Cross | Edson | Liberal | Resigned to run in the 1925 federal election | |
October 15, 19251 | Thomas Milnes | Claresholm | Independent Farmer | Resigned to run in the 1925 federal election | |
October 15, 19251 | Andrew McLennan | Edmonton | Liberal | Resigned to run in the 1925 federal election | |
October 15, 19251 | Stanley Tobin | Leduc | Liberal | Resigned to run in the 1925 federal election | |
October 15, 19251 | John Stewart | Lethbridge | Conservative | Resigned to run in the 1925 federal election | |
October 17, 1925 | William Davidson | Calgary | Independent | Resigned to run in the 1925 federal election | |
March 18, 1926 | Charles Mitchell | Bow Valley | Liberal | Resigned to accept judicial appointment. | |
May 1926 | George Mills | Athabasca | Independent Liberal | Left the Liberal caucus to run as an Independent Liberal |
- Exact date the Speaker received resignation unknown, nomination deadline date for the 1925 federal election used. All were received by Speaker Oran McPherson after September 29 and before October 17.
Read more about this topic: 5th Alberta Legislative Assembly
Famous quotes containing the words general and/or election:
“However energetically society in general may strive to make all the citizens equal and alike, the personal pride of each individual will always make him try to escape from the common level, and he will form some inequality somewhere to his own profit.”
—Alexis de Tocqueville (18051859)
“He hung out of the window a long while looking up and down the street. The worlds second metropolis. In the brick houses and the dingy lamplight and the voices of a group of boys kidding and quarreling on the steps of a house opposite, in the regular firm tread of a policeman, he felt a marching like soldiers, like a sidewheeler going up the Hudson under the Palisades, like an election parade, through long streets towards something tall white full of colonnades and stately. Metropolis.”
—John Dos Passos (18961970)